Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0849747

EP0849747 - Noise-limiting transformer apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/26]Noise-limiting transformer apparatus and method for making
[2001/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.12.2002  [2002/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/26]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jin, Sungho
145 Skyline Drive
Millington, New Jersey 07946 / US
02 / Van Dover, Robert Bruce
58 Jefferson Avenue
Maplewood, New Jersey 07040 / US
03 / Nemchik, Joseph Michael
24 Hanover Road
Florham Park, New Jersey 07932 / US
04 / Zhu, Wei
4 Scheurman Terrace
Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US
[1998/26]
Representative(s)Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue
Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/26]Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date97309027.711.11.1997
[1998/26]
Priority number, dateUS1996077061319.12.1996         Original published format: US 770613
[1998/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0849747
Date:24.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0849747
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01F19/04, H01F3/10
[1998/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/10]
Former [1998/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Geräuschbegrenzungstransformator[2001/14]
English:Noise-limiting transformer apparatus[2001/14]
French:Tranformateur de limitation du bruit[2001/14]
Former [1998/26]Geräuschbegrenzungstransformator und Verfahren zur Herstellung
Former [1998/26]Noise-limiting transformer apparatus and method for making
Former [1998/26]Tranformateur de limitation du bruit et procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure11.11.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
21.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/26]
07.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
10.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2001Fee for grant paid
23.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR898126  (LICENTIA GMBH) [Y] 1-3,11 * page 3, line 9 - page 68; figure - *;
 [Y]DE1061847  (KOEPENICK FUNKWERK VEB) [Y] 1-3,11 * column 1, line 18 - line 42; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3346659  (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2460254  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line L; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB2033163  (TDK ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *