EP0847174 - Method and apparatus for data network call processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T WIRELESS SERVICES, INC. 5000 Carillon Point Kirkland Washington 98033 / US | [2007/18] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states AT&T Wireless Services, Inc. 5000 Carillon Point Kirkland, Washington 98033 / US | ||
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amin, Umesh J. 10522 180 Court N.E. Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309093.9 | 12.11.1997 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | US19960762550 | 09.12.1996 Original published format: US 762550 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0847174 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0847174 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | [1999/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847174 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/00, H04L29/06, H04M7/00, H04L12/64 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04M3/46 (EP,US);
H04M3/465 (EP,US);
H04M2207/203 (EP,US);
H04M2242/22 (EP,US);
H04M3/42102 (EP,US);
H04Q3/72 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/24] | H04M3/00, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2000/26] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät für Datennetzwerkanrufverarbeitung | [1998/24] | English: | Method and apparatus for data network call processing | [1998/24] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour traitement d'appel dans un réseau de données | [1998/24] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9638018 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 10, line 33 - page 11, line 12 * * figure 1 *; | [A] - LOW C, "INTEGRATING COMMUNICATION SERVICES", HP LABORATORIES TECHNICAL REPORT, (19960901), no. 96/135, pages 1 - 11, XP002044189 [A] 1-19 * page 6, line 5 - line 8 * | [PA] - HANSSON A ET AL, "PHONE DOUBLER - A STEP TOWARDS INTEGRATED INTERNET AND TELEPHONE COMMUNITIES", ERICSSON REVIEW, (19970101), no. 4, ISSN 0014-0171, pages 142 - 151, XP000725693 [PA] 1-19 * page 147, column 2, line 27 - line 49 * |