Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0847159

EP0847159 - Method for apparatus for bandwidth reuse in a communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1998/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Lu, Xiaolin
E6 Sutton Drive
Matawan, New Jersey 07747 / US
[1998/24]
Representative(s)Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
4220 Nash Court
Oxford Business Park South
Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/24]Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date97309250.518.11.1997
[1998/24]
Priority number, dateUS1996076079005.12.1996         Original published format: US 760790
[1998/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0847159
Date:10.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0847159
Date:15.03.2000
[2000/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/207, H04J1/10, H04J1/08, H04J3/02
[2000/11]
Former International [1998/24]H04J14/02, H04J14/08, H04B10/207
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/47]
Former [1998/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wiederverwendung von Bandbreite in einem Nachrichtenübertragungs-Netzwerk[1998/24]
English:Method for apparatus for bandwidth reuse in a communication network[1998/24]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour réutilisation de largeur de bande dans un réseau de télécommunication[1998/24]
Examination procedure19.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
03.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/50]
09.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9610303  (ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-11,15-22,24 * page 6, line 19 - line 27 * * page 8, line 25 - line 28 * * page 10, line 12 - page 11, line 9 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 14 * * page 13, line 30 - page 14, line 10 * * page 15, line 18 - page 16, line 22; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0684713  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11,15-22,24 * column 7, line 7 - column 9, line 28 * * column 10, line 2 - line 22 * * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 18; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0658992  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-3,12-17,23,24 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 41 * * column 5, line 7 - line 28 * * column 12, line 43 - line 56 * * figures 1,2A,2B,12-15 *;
 [A]EP0651530  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 6-8,18,19 * abstract *