EP0845418 - Drive system for a packaging machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIVERWOOD INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 3350 Cumberland Circle, Suite 1600 Atlanta Georgia 30339 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states RIVERWOOD INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 3350 Cumberland Circle, Suite 1600 Atlanta, Georgia 30339 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jänen, Johannes Neue Strasse 13 53840 Troisdorf / DE | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Marles, Alan David Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309312.3 | 19.11.1997 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | GB19960024737 | 28.11.1996 Original published format: GB 9624737 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0845418 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0845418 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65B65/02, B65B59/00 | [1998/23] | CPC: |
B65B65/02 (EP,US);
B65B21/242 (EP);
B65B59/001 (EP,US);
B65B59/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/09] |
Former [1999/08] | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [1998/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antriebssystem für eine Verpackungsmaschine | [1998/23] | English: | Drive system for a packaging machine | [1998/23] | French: | Système d'entraînement pour une machine d'emballage | [1998/23] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.03.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB797148 (ATLANTA PAPER CO) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 123 - page 3, line 90; figure 3 *; | [A]FR2608999 (IMA SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 25; figure 4 *; | [A]DE8618502U (SITMA) [A] 6 * page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 * |