EP0849893 - Monitoring of nonlinear effects in an optical transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St.Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roberts, Kim Byron 41 Sherrards Park Road Welwyn Garden City, Herts AL8 7DL / GB | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Hermele, Daniel Stephen, et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | [2006/09] |
Former [2005/45] | Free, Rachel Alder, et al Nortel Networks Limited, IP Law Group, London Road Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2003/16] | Anderson, Angela, et al Nortel Networks IP Law Group, Harlow Laboratories, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [1998/26] | Ryan, John Peter William, et al Nortel Patents, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309355.2 | 20.11.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | US19960769986 | 19.12.1996 Original published format: US 769986 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0849893 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0849893 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849893 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/08 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
H04B10/2563 (EP,US);
H04B10/077 (EP,US);
H04B10/07955 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2001/30] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Überwachung von nichtlinearen Effekten in einem optischen Übertragungssystem | [1998/26] | English: | Monitoring of nonlinear effects in an optical transmission system | [1998/26] | French: | Surveillance d'effets non-linéaires dans un système de transmission optique | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 07.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.04.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 25.10.2006 | SE | 25.01.2007 | [2007/29] |
Former [2007/21] | NL | 25.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4947459 (NELSON LARRY A [US], et al) [A] 1,8,10,14* abstract *; | [YDA]US5410624 (MORKEL PAUL R [GB]) [YD] 6 * abstract * [A] 1,5,7,14; | [AD]US5513029 (ROBERTS KIM B [CA]) [AD] 1,7,10,14 * abstract *; | [XY] - BUHRGARD M ET AL, "COMPETITION BETWEEN FOUR-WAVE MIXING AND STIMULATED BRILLOUIN SCATTERING AT 1.3UM CW IN A SINGLE-MODE FIBRE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION (ECOC),S,GOTHENBURG, CHALMERS UNIVERSITY, (19890910), vol. CONF. 15, pages 154 - 157, XP000437776 [X] 1,5 * page 155, paragraph 2; figure 1 * [Y] 6 |