EP0844368 - Partial coating for gas turbine engine airfoils to increase fatigue strength [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Houston, David Paul 8 Buttonball Lane Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309501.1 | 25.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | US19960755842 | 26.11.1996 Original published format: US 755842 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0844368 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0844368 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0844368 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0844368 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/28, C23C30/00, C23C28/00 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
C23C4/01 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/22] | F01D5/28, C23C30/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/46] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Teilbeschichtung von Gasturbinenschaufeln zur Erhöhung der Dauerfestigkeit | [1998/22] | English: | Partial coating for gas turbine engine airfoils to increase fatigue strength | [1998/22] | French: | Revêtissement partiel des aubes de turbine à gaz pour améliorer la résistance à la fatigue | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 09.09.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 12.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.2005
26.10.2005
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.2005
26.10.2005
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.2005
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Abt. CT IP PG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 07.12.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.06.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.05.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.05.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.12.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0532150 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,10-16 * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 33; figure 4 * [Y] 3,4,6-9; | [DY]US4585481 (GUPTA DINESH K [US], et al) [DY] 6-9 * abstract *; | [DYA]US4719080 (DUHL DAVID N [US], et al) [DY] 3,4 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 12 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 12 * [A] 7-9 | Examination | EP0139396 |