Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0851210

EP0851210 - Non-contact strain meter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/27]Non-contact type of strain meter
[2003/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Atomic Energy Research Institute
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]For all designated states
Japan Atomic Energy Research Institute
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Futakawa, Masatoshi
Japan Atomic Energy Res. Inst., 2-4, Shirane
Tokai-mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken 319-11 / JP
02 / Kikuchi, Kenji
Japan Atomic Energy Res. Inst., 2-4, Shirane
Tokai-mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken 319-11 / JP
03 / Hino, Ryutaro
Japan Atomic Energy Res. Inst., 2-4, Shirane
Tokai-mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken 319-11 / JP
04 / Yanagida, Yoh, c/o ONO SOKKI Co., Ltd.
16-1, Hakusan 1-chome, Midori-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 226 / JP
05 / Yamamoto, Hiroshi, c/o ONO SOKKI Co., Ltd.
16-1, Hakusan 1-chome, Midori-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 226 / JP
[1998/27]
Representative(s)Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Hoborn
London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date97310384.919.12.1997
[1998/27]
Priority number, dateJP1996035004427.12.1996         Original published format: JP 35004496
[1998/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0851210
Date:01.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0851210
Date:24.01.2001
[2001/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0851210
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/16, G01L1/24
[2001/04]
Former International [1998/27]G01B11/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2001/41]
Former [1998/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Berührungslose Dehnungsmessapparatur[2002/50]
English:Non-contact strain meter[2003/01]
French:Dispositif de mesure de contraintes sans contact[1998/27]
Former [1998/27]Kontaktfreier Spannungsmesser
Former [1998/27]Non-contact type of strain meter
Examination procedure16.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/37]
18.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2003Fee for grant paid
16.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Request for further processing for:18.06.2002Request for further processing filed
27.06.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.07.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0694756  (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 28 * * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 37; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0629835  (SHIMDAZU CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 56 - column 6, line 30 * * column 7, line 48 - column 9, line 26; figure 6 *;
 [A]EP0347912  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4836031  (JATHO RALF [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *