Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0851226

EP0851226 - Carbon monoxide gas sensor and measuring device using the same sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/42]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
Former [1998/27]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yokota, Minoru
3-9, Takeda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-city, Aichi-prefecture, 467 / JP
02 / Murase, Takao
52, Minami, Maeno-cho
Konan-city, Aichi-prefecture, 483 / JP
03 / Mizusaki, Junichiro
3-405, 5-18, Nakayama, Aoba-ku
Sendai-city, Miyagi-prefecture, 980-77 / JP
[1998/27]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date97310542.223.12.1997
[1998/27]
Priority number, dateJP1996035144927.12.1996         Original published format: JP 35144996
JP1997033050101.12.1997         Original published format: JP 33050197
[1998/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0851226
Date:01.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0851226
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0851226
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/407, G01N33/00
[1999/44]
Former International [1998/27]G01N27/407
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/40]
Former [1998/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kohlenmonoxidsensor und Messvorrichtung unter Verwendung dieses Sensors[2005/21]
English:Carbon monoxide gas sensor and measuring device using the same sensor[1998/27]
French:Capteur pour monoxide de carbone et appareil utilisant ce capteur[1998/27]
Former [1998/27]Kohlenmonoxidsensor und Messvorrichtung unter verwendung dieses Sensors
Examination procedure02.11.1999Examination requested  [1999/52]
04.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2005Fee for grant paid
04.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
22.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR19.10.2005
IT19.10.2005
SE19.01.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/40]IT19.10.2005
FR31.12.2005
SE19.01.2006
Former [2008/07]IT19.10.2005
SE19.01.2006
Former [2006/27]SE19.01.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0468249  (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V [DE]) [Y] 1,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - line 41; figure 1 *;
 [Y]JPH04208849  ;
 [A]WO8606168  (BAYER DIAGNOSTIC & ELECTRONIC [DE]) [A] 1-4,7-22 * abstract * * page 9, line 7 - line 28; figure 1 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 16, no. 551, Database accession no. (P - 1453), [Y] 1,4 * abstract *
ExaminationUS5476001
 US5460711