Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0857810

EP0857810 - Steam iron water tank with air trap and gear mounts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark Delaware 19711 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kubicz, Edward M.
62 Santa Maria Drive
Torrington, Connecticut 06790 / US
02 / Marchetti, Michael J.
34 Lance Circle
Bridgeport, Connecticut 06606 / US
[1998/33]
Representative(s)Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe
European Group Headquarters
210 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Former [1998/33]Stagg, Diana Christine , et al
Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road
Birmingham B42 1BP / GB
Application number, filing date97310605.724.12.1997
[1998/33]
Priority number, dateUS1997078187510.01.1997         Original published format: US 781875
[1998/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0857810
Date:12.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0857810
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0857810
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:D06F75/14, D06F75/18
[1998/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/37]
Former [1998/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dampfbügeleisenwassertank mit Luftfalle und Vorrichtungen zur Montage von Zahnrädern[1998/33]
English:Steam iron water tank with air trap and gear mounts[1998/33]
French:Réservoir à eau de fer à repasser à vapeur avec piège à air et dispositifs de montage d'engrenages[1998/33]
Examination procedure10.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
06.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) NL
11.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2003Fee for grant paid
16.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5138778  (BRANDOLINI JEAN-LOUIS [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *