Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0787707

EP0787707 - Preparation of 1,1,1,3,3-pentachlorobutane and of 1,1,1,3,3-pentafluorobutane [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.04.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2020Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARKEMA FRANCE
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
[2007/42]
Former [2006/31]For all designated states
Arkema France
4-8, cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
ARKEMA
4-8 Cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
Atofina
4/8 Cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
Former [1997/32]For all designated states
ELF ATOCHEM S.A.
4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10
92800 Puteaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bertocchio, René
49 bis, Rue des Vallières
69390 Vourles par Vernaison / FR
02 / Lantz, André
Domaine de la Hêtraie
69390 Vernaison / FR
03 / Wendlinger, Laurent
44, avenue du Général de Gaulle
69230 Saint Genis Laval / FR
[1997/32]
Representative(s)Dang, Doris , et al
ARKEMA France
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Dang, Doris , et al
ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
Former [2008/37]Dang, Doris , et al
Arkema France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, ure d'Estienne d'Orves
F-92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
Former [2007/39]Dang, Doris , et al
ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
Former [2006/46]Dang, Doris , et al
ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 cours Michelet La Défense 10
92091 Paris La Défense / FR
Former [2003/15]Dang, Doris , et al
Atofina D.C.R.D./D.P.I. 4-8, cours Michelet La Défense 10
92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
Former [1997/32]Leboulenger, Jean , et al
Elf Atochem S.A., Département Propriété Industrielle, Cedex 42 - La Défense 10
92091 Paris la Défense / FR
Application number, filing date97400119.021.01.1997
[1997/32]
Priority number, dateFR1996000121401.02.1996         Original published format: FR 9601214
[1997/32]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0787707
Date:06.08.1997
Language:FR
[1997/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0787707
Date:18.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07C17/278, C07C17/20, C07C19/08
[1997/32]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL [1997/32]
TitleGerman:Herstellung von 1,1,1,3,3-Pentachlorbutan und von 1,1,1,3,3-Pentafluorbutan[1997/32]
English:Preparation of 1,1,1,3,3-pentachlorobutane and of 1,1,1,3,3-pentafluorobutane[1997/32]
French:Préparation du 1,1,1,3,3-pentachlorobutane et du 1,1,1,3,3-pentafluorobutane[1997/32]
Examination procedure25.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/32]
10.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2002Fee for grant paid
30.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02078805.5  / EP1270536
EP08171050.1  / EP2036874
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.06.2003  15.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Solvay (Société Anonyme)
Rue de Ransbeeck 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Opponent's representative
Mross, Stefan P.M.
Solvay SA
Intellectual Assets Management
RIC Lyon
85 avenue des Frères Perret, BP 62
69182 Saint-Fons / FR
 [2015/40]
Former [2012/21]
Opponent(s)01  18.06.2003  15.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Solvay (Société Anonyme)
Rue de Ransbeeck 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Opponent's representative
Mross, Stefan P.M.
Solvay S.A. Departement Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Former [2007/18]
Opponent(s)01  18.06.2003  15.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Solvay (Société Anonyme)
Rue du Prince Albert, 33
B-1050 Bruxelles / BE
Opponent's representative
Mross, Stefan P.M.
Solvay S.A. Departement Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Former [2003/33]
Opponent(s)01  18.06.2003   
Solvay (Société Anonyme)
Rue du Prince Albert, 33
B-1050 Bruxelles / BE
Opponent's representative
Jacques, Philippe
Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
02.07.2003No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
05.09.2003No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
18.09.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.03.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.11.2006Date of oral proceedings
17.01.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
05.02.2010Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
31.10.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
21.09.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.10.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.07.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
26.04.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.03.2007Appeal received No.  T0519/07
29.05.2007Statement of grounds filed
04.09.2008Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
20.08.2012Appeal received No.  T1841/12
12.05.2016Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
04.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
15.09.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
12.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
30.05.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB20.01.2017
ES22.01.2017
[2020/10]
Former [2020/09]GB20.01.2017
ES22.01.2017
DE26.04.2019
Former [2017/36]GB20.01.2017
ES22.01.2017
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0699649  (SOLVAY) [PX] 9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9504021  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC) [A] 9 * page 14 *
 [DY]  - FREIDLINA R K ET AL, "Telomerization of 2-chloropropene by carbon tetrachloride", IZV. AKAD. NAUK SSSR, SER. KHIM. (IASKA6,00023353);79; (8); PP.1903-5, INST. ELEMENTOORG. SOEDIN.;MOSCOW; USSR, XP002016172 [DY] 1-4

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00951020
    [ ] - BULLETIN OF THE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USSR DIVISION OF CHEM ICAL SCIENCE., NEW YORK US, (1979), vol. 28, no. 7, pages 1766 - 1769 [ ] * the whole document *
 [Y]  - KOTORA M ET AL, "Selective additions of polyhalogenated compounds to chloro-substituted ethenes catalyzed by a copper complex", REACT. KINET. CATAL. LETT. (RKCLAU,03044122);91; VOL.44 (2); PP.415-19, CZECH. ACAD. SCI.;INST. CHEM. PROCESS FUNDAM.; PRAGUE; 165 02; CZECH. (CS), XP000605752 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02073008
ExaminationUS3862978
    - Journal of Molecular Catalysis 77, (1992) 51-60