Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0787707 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0787707



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 830
06.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.04.2019 Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) Opposition 3
26.04.2019 Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) Opposition 3
11.12.2018 Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit Opposition 2
25.07.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
25.07.2018 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
25.07.2018 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
17.07.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
22.11.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.09.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.09.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.09.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 7
21.09.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 2
21.09.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.09.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
14.02.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
14.02.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
14.02.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.02.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
31.10.2016 Amended description with annotations Opposition 7
31.10.2016 Description Opposition 6
31.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
31.10.2016 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
13.09.2016 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
13.09.2016 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
13.09.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.07.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
22.07.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
30.05.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
30.05.2016 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
04.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.04.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.11.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
03.11.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
29.10.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 3
27.08.2015 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
08.08.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 6
05.08.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 6
21.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.06.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 3
15.04.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
11.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
11.04.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
08.03.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.12.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.12.2012 Claims Appeal 6
03.12.2012 Description Appeal 1
03.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.12.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
24.08.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
24.08.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.08.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.08.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.08.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
09.08.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
09.08.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 4
09.08.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.04.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
19.04.2012 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
15.03.2012 Request for a change of address - opponent Opposition 10
11.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.02.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
16.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.11.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.11.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.07.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
29.07.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
29.07.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.07.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
05.06.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
16.05.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.05.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.05.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.05.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.05.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 31
15.09.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 7
13.08.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
06.08.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
04.08.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
18.06.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.06.2008 Claims Appeal 1
10.06.2008 Claims Appeal 1
10.06.2008 Claims Appeal 1
10.06.2008 Claims Appeal 1
10.06.2008 Claims Appeal 1
10.06.2008 Claims Appeal 1
10.06.2008 Claims Appeal 1
10.06.2008 Claims Appeal 1
10.06.2008 Claims Appeal 1
10.06.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
06.06.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 13
04.06.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.06.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.05.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
09.05.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.05.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.04.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
24.04.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
23.04.2008 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.01.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.12.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.12.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
25.10.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
16.10.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.09.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
03.09.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
28.08.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 1
10.08.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
02.08.2007 Request for change of address Appeal 9
02.08.2007 Request for change of representative Appeal 12
19.06.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.06.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
01.06.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
29.05.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
04.04.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
16.03.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.03.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.03.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.02.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.02.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.01.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
17.01.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 14
17.01.2007 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.01.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
17.01.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Text intended for grant Opposition 6
09.01.2007 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.11.2006 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
06.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
06.11.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
06.11.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
31.10.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.10.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.10.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
26.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2006 Request for change of address Opposition 8
14.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
11.09.2006 Claims Opposition 2
11.09.2006 Claims Opposition 1
11.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
11.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
11.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
11.09.2006 Claims Opposition 1
11.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
11.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
11.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
11.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
11.09.2006 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
11.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.09.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
06.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
06.09.2006 Claims Opposition 2
06.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
06.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
06.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
06.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
06.09.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
06.09.2006 Claims Opposition 3
06.09.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.09.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.06.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
21.06.2006 Request for change of name Opposition 8
19.06.2006 Request for change of name Opposition 8
21.04.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.04.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.04.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.03.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
30.03.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.03.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.03.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
11.11.2004 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
11.11.2004 Request for change of name Opposition 3
05.03.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.03.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
08.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
18.09.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.09.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.09.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.09.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
02.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.07.2003 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 1
02.07.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 11
20.06.2003 General authorisation Opposition 1
20.06.2003 General authorisation Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.06.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
20.06.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.06.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.06.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
20.06.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.06.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
20.06.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.06.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.06.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.06.2003 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 13
26.02.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.02.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 5
08.08.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.04.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.04.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.03.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
14.03.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.03.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.11.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.11.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.11.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 8
07.09.2001 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
29.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
29.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
29.05.2001 Description Search / examination 7
29.05.2001 Description Search / examination 2
29.05.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.05.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
27.03.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.11.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.07.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
06.07.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
06.07.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.05.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.05.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.05.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.12.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.08.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
26.07.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.07.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.07.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.03.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
27.10.1997 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
10.04.1997 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
01.04.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.04.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
17.03.1997 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.03.1997 Priority document Search / examination 12
21.01.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.01.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
21.01.1997 Description Search / examination 6
21.01.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.1997 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
21.01.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6