Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0786442

EP0786442 - Process for the preparation of alkylchlorides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 27.03.2002  [2002/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE DES POUDRES ET EXPLOSIFS
12, quai Henri IV
F-75181 Paris Cédex 04 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/31]For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE DES POUDRES ET EXPLOSIFS
12, quai Henri IV
F-75181 Paris Cédex 04 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Demail, Hervé
13, Allée des Lilas
91710 Vert Le Petit / FR
02 / Le Gars, Pierre
240, Allée de Brantes
84700 Sorgues / FR
03 / Schweickert, Jean-Claude
11, Avenue Lyautey
91710 Vert Le Petit / FR
[1997/31]
Application number, filing date97400148.923.01.1997
[1997/31]
Priority number, dateFR1996000077724.01.1996         Original published format: FR 9600777
[1997/31]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0786442
Date:30.07.1997
Language:FR
[1997/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0786442
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07C17/16, C07C19/01
[1997/31]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/31]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkylchloriden[1997/31]
English:Process for the preparation of alkylchlorides[1997/31]
French:Procédé de préparation de chlorures d'alkyle[1997/31]
Examination procedure30.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/14]
11.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.1999Fee for grant paid
29.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS4830606  ;
 JPS58144328  [ ] (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS);
 [A]DE857350  (BASF AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 73, no. 39, Database accession no. 73-58021, XP002015554 & JPS4830606 A 00000000 (HOKKO CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, INC., "Alkyl chlorides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19840102), vol. 100, no. 1, Database accession no. 5828u, page 500, column 1, XP002015553 [A] 1 * abstract *