EP0799759 - Device for carrying a plastic mud guard on a metallic body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RENAULT 34 Quai du Point du Jour 92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states Renault 34 Quai du Point du Jour 92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ginestet, Thierry 13 rue Charles Linné 78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | [1997/41] | Application number, filing date | 97400714.8 | 28.03.1997 | [1997/41] | Priority number, date | FR19960004318 | 05.04.1996 Original published format: FR 9604318 | [1997/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799759 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799759 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B62D29/04 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
B62D29/048 (EP);
B60G2204/4404 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [1997/41] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Halten eines Plastik-Kotflügels an einem metallenen Fahrzeugteil | [1997/41] | English: | Device for carrying a plastic mud guard on a metallic body | [1997/41] | French: | Dispositif de retenue d'une aile plastique sur une caisse métallique | [1997/41] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 25.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 30.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Request for further processing for: | 10.10.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 10.10.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0346237 (RENAULT) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5098765 (BIEN) [A] 1-3,6 * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 10; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US5429412 (SCHOEN) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]US4707020 (ENOKIDA); | [DA]FR2720794 (RENAULT) |