Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0797979

EP0797979 - Cosmetic composition containing a binding polymer and an amphoteric starch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.01.2009
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
L'ORÉAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1997/40]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Dupuis, Christine
15, rue Seveste
75018 Paris / FR
[1997/40]
Representative(s)Dossmann, Gérard
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]Dossmann, Gérard
Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Morassistrasse 8
80469 München / DE
Former [1997/45]Andral, Christophe André Louis
L'OREAL Centre de Recherche Charles Zviak Département Propriété Industrielle 90, rue du Général Roguet
92583 Clichy Cedex / FR
Former [1997/40]Tetaz, Franck
L'OREAL, 90, rue du Général Roguet
92583 Clichy Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date97400726.228.03.1997
[1997/40]
Priority number, dateFR1996000436705.04.1996         Original published format: FR 9604367
[1997/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0797979
Date:01.10.1997
Language:FR
[1997/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0797979
Date:09.09.1998
Language:FR
[1998/37]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0797979
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/73, A61K8/81, A61Q5/04
[2009/09]
Former International [1997/40]A61K7/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1997/40]
TitleGerman:Ein bildendes Polymer und eine amphoterische Stärke enthaltende kosmetische Zusammensetzung[1997/40]
English:Cosmetic composition containing a binding polymer and an amphoteric starch[1997/40]
French:Composition cosmétique comprenant un polymère fixant et un amidon amphotère[1997/40]
Examination procedure16.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/40]
16.07.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
01.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.1997Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
27.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.1998Fee for grant paid
02.07.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.07.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.06.1999  06.07.1999  ADMISSIBLE
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation
501 Silverside Road P.O.Box 7663
Wilmington, Delaware 19803-7663 / US
Opponent's representative
Held, Stephan
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1999/35]
Opponent(s)01  09.06.1999  06.07.1999  ADMISSIBLE
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation
501 Silverside Road P.O.Box 7663
Wilmington, Delaware 19803-7663 / US
Opponent's representative
Held, Stephan, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem.
Patentanwälte, Hagemann, Braun und Held, Patentanwälte, Postfach 86 03 29
81630 München / DE
Former [1999/34]
Opponent(s)01  09.06.1999  06.07.1999  ADMISSIBLE
---
----
-- / DE
Opponent's representative
Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem.
Patentanwälte Hagemann, Braun & Held, Ismaninger Strasse 108
81675 München / DE
21.07.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.01.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.05.2001Date of oral proceedings
25.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.11.2001Reply to a communication from the opposition division
27.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2002Reply to a communication from the opposition division
07.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
19.01.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.01.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.07.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
11.09.2008Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition29.03.2006Appeal received No.  T0458/06
13.06.2006Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI09.09.1998
NL09.09.1998
CH31.03.2008
LI31.03.2008
[2010/05]
Former [2009/12]FI09.09.1998
CH31.03.2008
LI31.03.2008
Former [2001/29]FI09.09.1998
Former [2000/23]FI10.12.1998
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0689829  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-3 * * page 4, lines 54-58 * * examples 2,3 *
OppositionUS5482704