Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0807547

EP0807547 - Light fixation using a zigzag folded spring on the vehicle body [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.06.2001 [2001/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO VISION
34, rue Saint-André
93000 Bobigny / FR
[1997/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Donaire Camacho, Juan Manuel
c/o Valéo Management Serv., 2, rue André Boulle
94000 Creteil / FR
02 / Garcia Castilla, Jose
c/o Valéo Management Serv., 2, rue André Boulle
94000 Creteil / FR
[1997/47]
Representative(s)Le Forestier, Eric
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/47]Le Forestier, Eric
Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date97401052.212.05.1997
[1997/47]
Priority number, dateFR1996000598614.05.1996         Original published format: FR 9605986
[1997/47]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0807547
Date:19.11.1997
Language:FR
[1997/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0807547
Date:12.07.2000
Language:FR
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60Q1/04
[1997/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [1997/47]
TitleGerman:Leuchtenbefestigung mit akkordeonförmig gefalteter Feder an der Karosserie eines Fahrzeuges[1999/38]
English:Light fixation using a zigzag folded spring on the vehicle body[1997/47]
French:Fixation de feu sur carrosserie de véhicule automobile, comportant un ressort accordeon[1997/47]
Former [1997/47]Leuchtenbefestigung mit akkordeonförmig gefalteter Feder auf der Karosserie eines Fahrzeuges
Examination procedure27.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/26]
24.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2000Fee for grant paid
27.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US2138076  (TAYLOR ARNOLD N, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR899047  (RENAULT) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2258312  (WESTFAELISCHE METALL INDUSTRIE) [A] 1 * figure 1 *