Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0816002

EP0816002 - Gas confinement box used in combination with a welding head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.06.2001 [2001/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SNECMA MOTEURS
2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
Snecma Moteurs
2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
Former [1998/02]For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION Snecma
2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin
F-75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Camy, Florent
70, allée du Rubis
77170 Nandy / FR
02 / Zanolin, Gérard Louis
26, chemin du clos Prieuré
91490 Oncy sur Ecole / FR
[1998/02]
Application number, filing date97401485.426.06.1997
[1998/02]
Priority number, dateFR1996000798027.06.1996         Original published format: FR 9607980
[1998/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0816002
Date:07.01.1998
Language:FR
[1998/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0816002
Date:05.07.2000
Language:FR
[2000/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP13.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/16
[1998/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1998/38]
Former [1998/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mit einem Schweisskopf versehene geschlossene Gasdose[1998/02]
English:Gas confinement box used in combination with a welding head[1998/02]
French:Boîte de confinement de gaz utilisée avec une tête de soudage[1998/02]
Examination procedure07.07.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
23.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2000Fee for grant paid
22.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2504042  (SAFIAL [FR]) [X] 1,3 * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 4 * * page 8, line 15 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 4,7 *;
 SU1407723  [ ];
 [A]JPH01298145
    [] - 5, (19890301), vol. 89, no. 03, Database accession no. 89-021889/03, XP002025463 [ ] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900215), vol. 14, no. 80, Database accession no. (C - 0689), [A] 1-5 * abstract *