EP0829545 - Process for making a foaming slag on a stainless steel melt in an electric furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UGINE S.A. Immeuble La Pacific, 11/13, cours Valmy - La Défense 7 92800 Puteaux / FR | For all designated states UGINE-SAVOIE IMPHY Avenue Paul Girod 73400 Ugine / FR | [2000/52] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states USINOR SACILOR Société Anonyme Immeuble "La Pacific", 11/13 Cours Valmy, La Défense 7 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
For all designated states UGINE SAVOIE Avenue Paul Girod F-73403 Ugine Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillot, Yves Les Ratelières Marthod 73400 Ugine / FR | 02 /
Descaves, Frédéric 92 Boulevard Jean Jaurès 62330 Molinghem / FR | 03 /
Sollier, Luc Villar Lurin 73600 Moutiers / FR | 04 /
Bletton, Olivier 49 Chemin des Cèdres 73400 Ugine / FR | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Plaisant, Sophie Marie, et al ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 5 Rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie, et al ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 5 rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint Denis Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/02] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie, et al USINOR Groupe Arcelor Propriété Intellectuelle Immeuble la Pacific 13,cours Valmy 92070 La Défense cédex / FR | ||
Former [2000/52] | Ventavoli, Roger, et al USINOR, Direction Propriété Industrielle, Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense, 11/13 Cours Valmy, TSA 10001 92070 La Défense / FR | ||
Former [1998/12] | Ventavoli, Roger USINOR, Direction Propriété Industrielle, Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense, 11/13 Cours Valmy, TSA 10001 92070 La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 97401961.4 | 21.08.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | FR19960011120 | 12.09.1996 Original published format: FR 9611120 | [1998/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0829545 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0829545 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/54, C21C5/52 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
C21C5/5264 (EP,US);
C21C5/52 (KR);
C21C5/54 (EP,US);
C21C2005/366 (EP,US);
C21C2300/02 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US);
Y10S75/961 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/49] |
Former [1998/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erzeugen einer Schaumschlacke auf einer Rostfrei-Stahlschmelze in einem Elektroofen | [1998/12] | English: | Process for making a foaming slag on a stainless steel melt in an electric furnace | [1998/12] | French: | Procédé pour réaliser un laitier moussant au-dessus d'un acier inoxydable en fusion dans un four électrique | [1998/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 07.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE Praxair, Inc. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, Ct. 06810-5113 / US Opponent's representative Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB, et al, et al Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE Praxair, Inc. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, Ct. 06810-5113 / US Opponent's representative Schwan - Schwan - Schorer, et al, et al Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | 31.05.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.11.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.12.2002 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2003 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 10.05.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.01.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/17] | Appeal following opposition | 30.08.2004 | Appeal received No. T1049/04 | 28.10.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.01.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 18.07.2001 | NL | 18.07.2001 | CH | 31.08.2001 | LI | 31.08.2001 | DK | 18.10.2001 | PT | 18.10.2001 | GR | 19.10.2001 | AT | 21.08.2005 | FI | 21.08.2005 | GB | 21.08.2005 | IT | 21.08.2005 | ES | 22.08.2005 | SE | 22.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | LU | 31.08.2005 | DE | 01.03.2006 | FR | 28.04.2006 | [2007/34] |
Former [2007/17] | IE | 18.07.2001 | |
NL | 18.07.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
DK | 18.10.2001 | ||
PT | 18.10.2001 | ||
GR | 19.10.2001 | ||
AT | 21.08.2005 | ||
FI | 21.08.2005 | ||
GB | 21.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
SE | 22.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
FR | 28.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | IE | 18.07.2001 | |
NL | 18.07.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
DK | 18.10.2001 | ||
PT | 18.10.2001 | ||
GR | 19.10.2001 | ||
AT | 21.08.2005 | ||
FI | 21.08.2005 | ||
SE | 22.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | IE | 18.07.2001 | |
NL | 18.07.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
DK | 18.10.2001 | ||
PT | 18.10.2001 | ||
GR | 19.10.2001 | ||
AT | 21.08.2005 | ||
FI | 21.08.2005 | ||
SE | 22.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/27] | IE | 18.07.2001 | |
NL | 18.07.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
DK | 18.10.2001 | ||
PT | 18.10.2001 | ||
GR | 19.10.2001 | ||
FI | 21.08.2005 | ||
SE | 22.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | IE | 18.07.2001 | |
NL | 18.07.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
DK | 18.10.2001 | ||
PT | 18.10.2001 | ||
GR | 19.10.2001 | ||
FI | 21.08.2005 | ||
Former [2004/51] | IE | 18.07.2001 | |
NL | 18.07.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
DK | 18.10.2001 | ||
PT | 18.10.2001 | ||
GR | 19.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | IE | 18.07.2001 | |
NL | 18.07.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
DK | 18.10.2001 | ||
PT | 18.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | IE | 18.07.2001 | |
NL | 18.07.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
PT | 18.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | IE | 18.07.2001 | |
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
PT | 18.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | IE | 18.07.2001 | |
PT | 18.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | PT | 18.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS531618 ; | [X]US4528035 (SIMPSON JR WILLIAM B [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]EP0162679 (METRO MATERIALS CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0655508 (SVILUPPO MATERIALI SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]LU88577 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE [BE]); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 08, Database accession no. 78-14675A, XP002031889 & JPS531618 A 19780109 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |