Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0828129

EP0828129 - Conveyor with positioning and locking means for the conveyed products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2002
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CERIC
56, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/11]For all designated states
Ceric
56, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Jacquet, André
17, rue de Locarno
95120 Ermont / FR
[1998/11]
Representative(s)Loyer, Bertrand
Cabinet Loyer & Abello 9, rue de la Forge
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/11]Loyer, Bertrand
Cabinet Loyer, 78, avenue Raymond Poincaré
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date97401992.927.08.1997
[1998/11]
Priority number, dateFR1996001075804.09.1996         Original published format: FR 9610758
[1998/11]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0828129
Date:11.03.1998
Language:FR
[1998/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828129
Date:25.04.2001
Language:FR
[2001/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:F27D3/00, F27D5/00, B65G47/26, F27D3/12
[1998/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   IT [1998/48]
Former [1998/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Förderstrecke mit einer Bremslaufrollen- und Positioniervorrichtung für die gefördeten Produkten[1998/11]
English:Conveyor with positioning and locking means for the conveyed products[1998/11]
French:Convoyeur muni d'un dispositif de positionnement et de calage de produits transportés sur un convoyeur[1998/11]
Examination procedure07.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/45]
27.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2001Fee for grant paid
12.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.04.2001
[2008/07]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4104806  (BAYERISCHE DACHZIEGELWERKE BOGEN GMBH);
 [A]DE4127207  (KOLBUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]);
 [A]US5056656  (POELL MARTIN [AT]);
 [A]GB2076512  (LINGL HANS);
 [A]EP0168573  (LINGL ANLAGENBAU [DE]);
 [A]FR2567493  (SECAIL JEAN [FR]);
 [A]US1641186  (MEEHAN PAUL A);
 [A]EP0599674  (STEIN HEURTEY [FR]);
 [A]JPS60144228  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD)