Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0829454 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0829454



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 161
07.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.11.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.07.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
09.07.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 25
24.06.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.06.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.06.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
18.06.1999 Filing of a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
18.06.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
05.06.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.03.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
11.03.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
01.02.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
19.11.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.11.1997 European search report Search / examination 3
03.09.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.09.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
03.09.1997 Description Search / examination 36
03.09.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.1997 Drawings Search / examination 1
03.09.1997 Priority document Search / examination 20
03.09.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7