Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0829454


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
19.11.1999 (Expected) grant published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
23.09.1999 Renewal fee
02.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.03.1999 First examination report
08.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.10.1998 Definitive list of designations published on  02.12.1998 [1998/49]
18.09.1998 Request for examination filed published on  04.11.1998 [1998/45]
30.01.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.03.1998 [1998/12]