Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0829454

EP0829454 - Non-stoichiometric ytterbium phosphate powder of low infrared reflectivity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]For all designated states
SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD.
6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takai, Yasushi
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 1-5, Kitago
2-chome, Takefu-shi, Fukui-ken / JP
02 / Kimura, Yuji
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 1-5, Kitago
2-chome, Takefu-shi, Fukui-ken / JP
03 / Sakai, Shigeru
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 1-5, Kitago
2-chome, Takefu-shi, Fukui-ken / JP
[1998/12]
Representative(s)Armengaud Ainé, Alain , et al
Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud
75116 Paris / FR
[1998/12]
Application number, filing date97402052.103.09.1997
[1998/12]
Priority number, dateJP1996024307513.09.1996         Original published format: JP 24307596
[1998/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0829454
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0829454
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:C01B25/37, C01B25/45, C09D11/00, C09K11/81, C09D5/22
[1998/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/49]
Former [1998/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nichtstöchiometrisches Ytterbiumphosphatpulver mit niedrigem Infrarot-Reflexionsvermögen[1998/12]
English:Non-stoichiometric ytterbium phosphate powder of low infrared reflectivity[1998/12]
French:Poudre de phosphate d'ytterbium non stochiométrique à faible réflexion infrarouge[1998/12]
Examination procedure03.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/45]
11.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.1999Fee for grant paid
24.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH08209110  (DAINIPPON CO. LTD.);
 [A]JPH0753946  ;
 JPH0859217  [ ] (SHINETSU CHEM. IND. CO.);
 [A]EP0581622  (RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE) [A] 3-8 * claims 1-23 * * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0646631  (HITACHI MAXEL LTD) [A] 2,9 * examples 4,6 * * claims 1-4,6-11,13-18 *;
 [A]EP0524034  (RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-3,8 *
 [PA]  - TAJIMA SHINJI ET AL., "Ytterbium phosphate infrared-adsorbing materials, their manufacture, inks, invisible patterns, and information patterns containing them", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19961125), vol. 125, no. 22, Database accession no. 278841, XP002044211 [PA] 1,3,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 17, Database accession no. 95-128628, XP002044212 & JPH0753946 A 19950228 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1,3,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - HUKUO KENITI ET AL., "Syntheses of rare earth orthophosphates (RPO4.nH2O, R= La-Yb, n=0-2)", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19810713), vol. 95, no. 2, Database accession no. 17205e, XP002046104 [A] 1-3 * abstract *
    [ ] - NAGOYA KOGYO DAIGAKU GAKUKO, (1980), vol. 31, pages 175 - 182
 [A]  - KIMURA JUJI ET AL., "Rare earth element phosphate salt particles and their manufacture", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960722), vol. 125, no. 4, Database accession no. 44624, XP002044229 [A] 2,3 * abstract *