Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0835003

EP0835003 - Channel add-drop device over a multichannel bidirectional optical link [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.10.2001
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[1999/08]
Former [1998/15]For all designated states
ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Gautheron, Olivier
10, rue Saint Martin
78180 Montigny Le Bretonneux / FR
02 / Letellier, Vincent
144, avenue d'Italie
75013 Paris / FR
[1998/15]
Representative(s)Lamoureux, Bernard , et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
54 Rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/15]Lamoureux, Bernard , et al
Alcatel Alsthom, Département Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date97402263.429.09.1997
[1998/15]
Priority number, dateFR1996001205703.10.1996         Original published format: FR 9612057
[1998/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0835003
Date:08.04.1998
Language:FR
[1998/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0835003
Date:29.11.2000
Language:FR
[2000/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/24, H04J14/02
[1998/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   GB,   IT [1998/52]
Former [1998/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kanal Einfügungs/Ausblendungsvorrichtung über eine optische bidirektionale Mehrkanalverbindung[1998/15]
English:Channel add-drop device over a multichannel bidirectional optical link[1998/15]
French:Dispositif d'insertion/extraction de canaux sur une liaison optique multicanaux bidirectionnelle[1998/15]
Examination procedure22.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/45]
20.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2000Fee for grant paid
10.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK28.02.2001
[2003/46]
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2687030  (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 28; figures 3,4 *
 [A]  CHAWKI ET AL, "Evaluation of an Optical Boosted Add/Drop Multiplexer OBADM including circulators and fiber grating filters", 21ST EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION ECOC 95, (19950917), vol. 1, pages 47 - 50, XP002032556 [A] 1,2 * page 47, paragraph 3; figures 1A,1B *
 [A]  JONES K P ET AL, "OPTICAL WAVELENGTH ADD-DROP MULTIPLEXER IN INSTALLED SUBMARINE WDM NETWORK", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19951123), vol. 31, no. 24, page 2117/2118, XP000548194 [A] 1 * page 2117, column R, paragraph 2; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19951424