Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0838583

EP0838583 - Apparatus for monitoring the operations of an engine, in particular the engine of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.03.2001 [2001/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT
75, Avenue de la Grande Armée
75116 Paris / FR
For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES CITROEN
62, Boulevard Victor Hugo
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
[1998/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Riou, Daniel
4 Parc de la Bérengère
92210 Saint Cloud / FR
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/18]Habasque, Etienne Joel Jean-François , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date97402543.927.10.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateFR1996001313828.10.1996         Original published format: FR 9613138
[1998/18]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0838583
Date:29.04.1998
Language:FR
[1998/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0838583
Date:22.03.2000
Language:FR
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/22, F02D41/38
[1998/18]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI,   PT,   SE [1999/02]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Überwachung des Betriebs eines Dieselmotors, insbesondere eines Kraftfahrzeuges[1998/18]
English:Apparatus for monitoring the operations of an engine, in particular the engine of a vehicle[1998/18]
French:Dispositif de contrôle du fonctionnement d'un moteur diesel notamment de véhicule automobile[1998/18]
Examination procedure09.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/19]
29.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.1999Fee for grant paid
18.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US4334422  (KAWAI HISASI, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 24 - line 49 * * column 5, line 1 - line 31 *;
 [PA]DE19548279  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 1 * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 48 *;
 [A]US4643023  (CAPPS DAVID F [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 22 * * column 3, line 15 - line 62 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 29 * * column 7, line 12 - line 28 *;
 [A]US4356551  (IWASE KAZUO, et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]JPS6026164
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850625), vol. 009, no. 149, Database accession no. (M - 390), [A] 1 * abstract *