EP0845466 - Silicon containing filtering agents and cosmetic sunscreen compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richard, Hervé 31 rue Robert Schumann 93420 Villepinte / FR | 02 /
Leduc, Madeleine Rés. Les Chèvrefeuillez, Appt. 65 29 rue des Boulets, 75011 Paris / FR | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Miszputen, Laurent L'OREAL Département Propriété Industrielle Centre Charles Zviak 90, rue du Général Roguet 92583 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402629.6 | 04.11.1997 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | FR19960014598 | 28.11.1996 Original published format: FR 9614598 | [1998/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0845466 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0845466 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/08, C07F7/21, A61K7/42, A61K7/48 | [1998/23] | CPC: |
A61K8/585 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
C07F7/0838 (EP);
C07F7/21 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/08] |
Former [1998/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Silizium-enthaltende Sonnenschutzmittel, und diese enthaltende Sonnenschutzzusammensetzungen | [1998/23] | English: | Silicon containing filtering agents and cosmetic sunscreen compositions containing them | [1998/23] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés de filtres siliciés sur leur partie ester, compositions cosmétiques photoprotectrices les contenant et utilisations | [1998/23] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 10.02.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9310745 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US5315022 (YOSHIDA MASASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * column W *; | [X]EP0157481 (DOW CORNING [GB]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0138321 (DOW CORNING [GB]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0138590 (DOW CORNING [GB]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | JPH08268856 [ ] (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | JPH03287591 [ ] (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | JPH03204887 [ ] (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | JPH07223932 [ ] (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | JPH0388816 [ ] (SUMITOMO DUREZ CO, et al) | [X] - KUROSAWA, T., "water- or perspiration-resistant long-lasting sunscreens containing silicon-containing cinnamates and film-forming substances", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19970120), vol. 126, no. 3, Database accession no. 36860, XP002032685 [X] 1-16 * abstract * | [X] - YOSHIDA, M. ET AL., "preparation of silyl-substituted cinnamate esters as uv absorbers", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920511), vol. 116, no. 19, Database accession no. 194586c, XP002032686 [X] 1-16 * abstract * | [X] - YOSHIDA, M. ET AL., "preparation of cinnamte-containing silicones as uv absorbers for cosmetics", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920803), vol. 117, no. 5, Database accession no. 48900e, XP002032687 [X] 1-16 * abstract * | [X] - YOSHIDA, M. ET AL., "skin preparations containing cinnamic acid silicone derivatives and perfluoroalkyl-containing dimethylpolysiloxanes", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19951225), vol. 123, no. 26, Database accession no. 349880q, XP002032688 [X] 1-16 * abstract * | [X] - MATSUKAWA, K. ET AL., "silicone-modified vinyl ester resins", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19911021), vol. 115, no. 16, Database accession no. 160540x, XP002032689 [X] 1 * abstract * |