Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0848397

EP0848397 - Manufacturing process of a soft magnetic iron based alloy component with nanocristalline structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mecagis
Immeuble "La Pacific" - La Défense 7, 11/13 Cours Valmy
92800 Puteaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/25]For all designated states
Mecagis
Immeuble "La Pacific" - La Défense 7, 11/13 Cours Valmy
92800 Puteaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Couderchon, Georges
43 route de l'Etang
58160 Sauvigny lès Bois / FR
02 / Verin, Philippe
28 rue Val de Loire
58160 Sauvigny lès Bois / FR
[1998/25]
Representative(s)Ventavoli, Roger
Usinor Direction Propriété Industrielle Imeuble "La Pacific" 11/13 Cours Valmy
92070 La Défense / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/25]Ventavoli, Roger
USINOR, Direction Propriété Industrielle, Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense, 11/13 Cours Valmy, TSA 10001
92070 La Défense / FR
Application number, filing date97402667.607.11.1997
[1998/25]
Priority number, dateFR1996001519711.12.1996         Original published format: FR 9615197
[1998/25]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0848397
Date:17.06.1998
Language:FR
[1998/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0848397
Date:18.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01F41/02, H01F1/153
[1998/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/25]
TitleGerman:Herstellungsverfahren für eine auf Eisen basierende weichmagnetische Komponente mit nanokristalliner Struktur[2002/03]
English:Manufacturing process of a soft magnetic iron based alloy component with nanocristalline structure[1998/25]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un composant magnétique en alliage magnétique doux à base de fer ayant une structure nanocristalline[1998/25]
Former [1998/25]Herstellungsverfahren für eine auf Eisen basierende weichmagnetische Komponente mit nanokristallinen Struktur
Examination procedure17.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/08]
13.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2002Fee for grant paid
29.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
DK18.12.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
MC01.06.2003
[2007/17]
Former [2006/44]AT18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
MC01.06.2003
Former [2005/21]AT18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/29]GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE18.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPS6047407  ;
 [A]US4262233  (BECKER JOSEPH J, et al) [A] 1,4 * claims 1,4,8 *
 [YA]  - HECZKO O ET AL, "MAGNETIC PROPERTIES OF COMPACTED ALLOY FE73.5CU1NB3SI13.5B9 IN AMORPHOUS AND NANOCRYSTALLINE STATE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, (19931101), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 2670 - 2672, XP000432293 [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.280945
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850723), vol. 009, no. 178, Database accession no. (E - 330), [Y] 1 * abstract *