Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0878287

EP0878287 - Expanding device for forming bells at plastic or plastic/aluminium tube ends [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VIRAX S.A.
39/41 Quai de Marne B.P. 197
F-51206 Epernay Cédex / FR
[1998/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Tandart, Jean-Marie
1, rue des Partelaines
51200 Epernay / FR
[1998/47]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain , et al
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/27]Rhein, Alain , et al
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 17 Rue de la Forêt
67550 Vendenheim / FR
Former [2001/42]Rhein, Alain , et al
c/o Cabinet Bleger-Rhein, 8, Avenue Pierre Mendès France
67300 Schiltigheim / FR
Former [1999/04]Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Philippe
Cabinet Maisonnier, 26, place Bellecour
69002 Lyon / FR
Former [1998/47]Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Philippe
Cabinet Maisonnier, 28, rue Servient
69003 Lyon / FR
Application number, filing date97440044.212.05.1997
[1998/47]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0878287
Date:18.11.1998
Language:FR
[1998/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0878287
Date:25.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:B29C57/04, B29C55/24
[1998/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/47]
TitleGerman:Aufweitungsvorrichtung zum Formen von Muffen an Kunststoff- oder Kunststoff/Aluminium-Rohrenden[1998/47]
English:Expanding device for forming bells at plastic or plastic/aluminium tube ends[1998/47]
French:Dispositif d'expansion pour réaliser des emboîtures aux extrémités de tuyaux en matière plastique, ou complexe plastique-aluminium[1998/47]
Examination procedure22.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/25]
17.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
21.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2002Fee for grant paid
10.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200004   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2000
31.05.200105   M06   Fee paid on   02.03.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
AT12.05.2003
LU12.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
[2007/17]
Former [2005/21]FI25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
AT12.05.2003
LU12.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
Former [2005/02]IE25.09.2002
AT12.05.2003
LU12.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
Former [2004/43]IE25.09.2002
AT12.05.2003
LU12.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2004/39]IE25.09.2002
LU12.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2004/28]IE25.09.2002
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2004/22]IE25.09.2002
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2003/42]IE25.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0718057  (ROTHENBERGER WERKZEUGE MASCH [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9418486  (WIRSBO BRUKS AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 38 * * figures 8-10 *;
 [A]FR2738512  (SEPMA SA [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]CH475078  (YAMAMOTO ISAO [JP]) [A] 1 * figure - *