blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0845872

EP0845872 - Transmission of wideband signals in a net with stationary signal interference [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[1999/08]
Former [1998/23]For all designated states
ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Heidemann, Rolf Dr.
Weinsberger Weg 14
71732 Tamm / DE
02 / Krimmel, Heinz
Am Gänsegarten 3
70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE
[1998/23]
Representative(s)Schätzle, Albin, et al
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/23]Schätzle, Albin, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Alcatel Alsthom Intellectual Property Department, Postfach 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97440113.519.11.1997
[1998/23]
Priority number, dateDE199614908527.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19649085
[1998/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0845872
Date:03.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0845872
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04B1/707, H04J13/00
[2000/03]
CPC:
H04J13/0022 (EP,US); H04B1/69 (EP,US); H04J13/004 (EP,US);
H04J13/10 (EP,US); H04N21/6118 (EP,US); H04N21/6168 (EP,US);
H04N7/17309 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1998/23]H04B1/707
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/39]
Former [1998/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Übertragung von breitbandigen Signalen in einem durch stationäre Signale gestörten Netz[1998/23]
English:Transmission of wideband signals in a net with stationary signal interference[1998/23]
French:Transmission de signaux à bande large dans un réseau perturbé par des signaux stationnaires[1998/23]
Examination procedure01.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
24.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/50]
10.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]  - DAVIS M E ET AL, "Filtered spreading sequences for interference avoidance", 1ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, ICUPC '92 PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.92TH0434-1), DALLAS, TX, USA, 29 SEPT.-1 OCT. 1992, 1992, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-0591-4, pages 02.06/1 - 5, XP002123883 [A] 1,3,7,10,12 * page 54, column L, line 13 - line 28; figure 1 * * page 54, column R, line 12 - line 33 * * page 55, column L, line 28 - column R, line 12 * * page 57, column R, line 10 - line 33 *
 [A]  - GEVARGIZ J ET AL, "ADAPTIVE NARROW-BAND INTERFERENCE REJECTION IN A DS SPREAD-SPECTRUMINTERCEPT RECEIVER USING TRANSFORM DOMAIN SIGNAL PROCESSING TECHNIQUES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 37, no. 12, ISSN 0090-6778, page 1359-1365, XP000100731 [A] 1,3,7,10,12 * page 1359, column R, line 11 - line 38 * * page 1361, column L, line 12 - line 47 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.44207
 [A]  - ILTIS R A ET AL, "INTERFERENCE REJECTION IN FFH SYSTEMS USING LEAST SQUARES ESTIMATION TECHNIQUES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 38, no. 12, ISSN 0090-6778, page 2174-2182, XP000203349 [A] 2,5 * page 2174, column L, line 32 - column R, line 50 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.64660
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.