blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0848529

EP0848529 - Method for selecting and executing free programmable functions of a telephone set and corresponding telephone set [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[1999/08]
Former [1998/25]For all designated states
ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Siegmund, Gerd
Geisslerstrasse 4
70435 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Felbecker-Janho, Heike
Kornwestheimer Strasse 219
70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE
[1998/25]
Representative(s)Brose, Gerhard, et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/25]Brose, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Alcatel Alsthom Intellectual Property Department, Postfach 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97440133.315.12.1997
[1998/25]
Priority number, dateDE199615183313.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19651833
[1998/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0848529
Date:17.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0848529
Date:25.07.2001
[2001/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2001
ClassificationIPC:H04M1/00, H04M3/42
[1998/25]
CPC:
H04M3/42178 (EP,US); H04M1/247 (EP,US); H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M1/2471 (EP); H04M1/72406 (EP,US); H04M2203/053 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2002/16]
Former [1998/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Einstellen und Durchführen frei programmierbarer Funktionen eines Fernmeldeendgeräts, sowie ein solches Fernmeldeendgerät[1998/25]
English:Method for selecting and executing free programmable functions of a telephone set and corresponding telephone set[1998/25]
French:Méthode de sélection et d'exécution de fonctions librement programmables d'un appareil téléphonique et appareil téléphonique correspondant[1998/25]
Examination procedure22.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/46]
01.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/01]
04.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4782517  (BERNARDIS JEFFREY J [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 48 - column 6, line 37; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0365200  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 5 - column 7, line 55; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]WO9322885  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * page 3, line 20 - page 7, line 23; figure 11 *;
 [A]DE4330757  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,4* column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US5402483  (WEINBERGER GUENTER [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 8 - column 4, line 13; figure 1 *;
 [X]US5541986  (HOU DAVID T [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 5 - line 13 * * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 21; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5581601  (ABRAMOWSKI STEPHAN DR [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 55 - column 7, line 15; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]  - AHRENS, "POTENTIAL FUTURE APPLICATIONS OF DIRECT, AUTOMATED SERVICE ACTIVATION", JOURNAL OF NETWORK AND SYSTEMS MANAGEMENT,PLENUM PUBLISHING CO,US, (199303), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1064-7570, pages 57 - 70, XP000852623 [A] 1,3,4 * page 59, line 20 - page 60, line 24 * * page 65, line 6 - page 69, line 6; figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01026828
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.