Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0812026

EP0812026 - A communication system and methods utilizing a reactively controlled directive array [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/50]For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pritchett, Don Michael
14 Azalea Drive
Apalachin, NY 13732 / US
[1997/50]
Representative(s)de Pena, Alain
Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle
06610 La Gaude / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/50]de Pena, Alain
Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
06610 La Gaude / FR
Application number, filing date97480024.523.05.1997
[1997/50]
Priority number, dateUS1996065832705.06.1996         Original published format: US 658327
[1997/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0812026
Date:10.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0812026
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01Q3/24, H01Q3/44
[1997/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/50]
TitleGerman:Kommunikationssystem und -verfahren mit Verwendung einer reaktanzgesteuerten Gruppenantenne mit Richtcharakteristik[1997/50]
English:A communication system and methods utilizing a reactively controlled directive array[1997/50]
French:Système et procédés de communication utilisant un réseau d'antennes à directivité à contrôle réactif[1997/50]
Examination procedure24.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
30.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.05.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.05.2006
09.05.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
13.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/49]
23.07.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/49]
Request for further processing for:06.01.2004Request for further processing filed
05.01.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
15.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
06.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
16.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
10.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200610   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9315565  (INVENTAHL AB [SE]) [A] 1,5 * page 1, line 1 - page 11, line 35 * * page 17, line 6 - page 18, line 12 *;
 [X]EP0568507  (TELEVERKET [SE]) [X] 6 * the whole document *;
 [DX]US4700197  (MILNE ROBERT [CA]) [DX] 6 * the whole document *;
 [DX]US4631546  (DUMAS TED A [US], et al) [DX] 6 * the whole document *