EP0785143 - Method for manufacturing loading platforms with replaceable feet, and platform manufactured with said procedure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIDECART, S.A. Carretera de Aoiz, s/n 31486 Ibiricu de Egües Navarra / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states Videcart, S.A. Carretera de Aoiz, s/n 31486 Ibiricu de Egües, Navarra / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teixidor Casanovas, Jaime Passeig Francesc Marimon, 69 08292 Esparreguera, Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Amaya Mele, Leopoldo Calle Girona 81 08400 Granollers, Barcelona / ES | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [1997/30] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida, et al Pg. de Gracia, 33 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 97500005.0 | 15.01.1997 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | ES19960000106 | 18.01.1996 Original published format: ES 9600106 | [1997/30] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0785143 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0785143 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0785143 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/40, B32B31/00, B65D19/00 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
B65D19/40 (EP,US);
B65D19/0002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/30] | B65D19/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Ladeflächen mit erneuerbaren Füssen, und die so hergestellte Ladefläche | [1997/30] | English: | Method for manufacturing loading platforms with replaceable feet, and platform manufactured with said procedure | [1997/30] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication des platformes de chargement avec les pieds renouvables, et platformes fabriquées par ce procédé | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2001 | BE | 05.12.2001 | CH | 05.12.2001 | FI | 05.12.2001 | GR | 05.12.2001 | IT | 05.12.2001 | LI | 05.12.2001 | NL | 05.12.2001 | IE | 15.01.2002 | DK | 05.03.2002 | PT | 05.03.2002 | SE | 05.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
IE | 15.01.2002 | ||
DK | 05.03.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
IE | 15.01.2002 | ||
DK | 05.03.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
IE | 15.01.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 05.12.2001 | |
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 05.12.2001 | |
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 05.12.2001 | |
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 05.12.2001 | |
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 05.12.2001 | |
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 05.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2706099 (WHALLEY GEORGE E)[A] 4; | [A]FR1592807 (LAFARGE EMBELLAGE) [A] 4; | [A]FR2087654 (MENIGAULT ANDRE) [A] 1; | [A]US3685463 (FRANCIS WILLIAM J) [A] 1; | [A]FR2138680 (HOOKE LIONEL) [A] 1; | [A]GB2089316 (HIGGINBOTTOM DONALD, et al) [A] 4 * page 3, column 2, line 104 - line 108; figure 3 *; | [DAP]WO9635620 (TEIXIDOR CASANOVAS JAIME [ES], et al) [DAP] 1,4 * abstract * | by applicant | ES9500892 | ES9502178 | WO1996ES00100 |