Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0818240

EP0818240 - Procedure for the regeneration of catalysts and absorbent materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSIDAD DE SALAMANCA
Patio de Escuelas Menores, no.1-1o
37007 Salamanca / ES
[N/P]
Former [1998/03]For all designated states
UNIVERSIDAD DE SALAMANCA
Patio de Escuelas Menores, no.1-1o
E-37007 Salamanca / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Salvador Palacios, Francisco
Arroyo de Santo Domingo 10
370001 Salamanca / ES
02 / Sanchez Jimenez, Carmen
Plaza de Gabriel Y Galan No 6, 10-C
37005 Salamanca / ES
[1998/03]
Representative(s)Hernandez Covarrubias, Arturo , et al
c/o Clarke, Modet & Co., Goya, 11
28001 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]Hernandez Covarrubias, Arturo , et al
c/o Clarke, Modet & Co., Goya, 11
28001 Madrid / ES
Former [1998/03]Hernandez Covarrubias, Arturo
c/o Clarke, Modet & Co., Avda. de los Encuartes 21
28760 Tres Cantos (Madrid) / ES
Application number, filing date97500119.904.07.1997
[1998/03]
Priority number, dateES1996000156011.07.1996         Original published format: ES 9601560
[1998/03]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0818240
Date:14.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0818240
Date:29.04.1998
[1998/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0818240
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:B01J38/48, B01J20/34
[1998/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/02]
Former [1998/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Regenerieren von Katalysatoren und Sportionsmitteln[1998/03]
English:Procedure for the regeneration of catalysts and absorbent materials[1998/03]
French:Procédé de régénération de catalysateurs et de matériaux absorbants[1998/03]
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
22.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/34]
16.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
27.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2001Fee for grant paid
04.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU04.07.2002
[2004/39]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2716797  (LITTLE INC A)
 [X]  JIMENEZ C S ET AL, "A new method for regenerating activated carbon by thermal desorption with liquid water under subcritical conditions", CARBON, (1996), vol. 34, no. 4, page 511-516, XP004022336 [X] 1-3 * page 512, column 2, line 19 - page 516, column 1, line 16 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6223(95)00211-1
 [X]  J. M. L. PENNINGER, "Extraction of Oily Matter from Spent Bleaching Earth with Water at Elevated Temperature and Pressure", J. CHEM. TECH. BIOTECHNOL., SOCIETY OF CHEMICAL INDUSTRY, (1979), vol. 29, pages 154 - 157, XP002044233 [X] 1-3 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS5362405
 US4571300