Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0850699

EP0850699 - Bar screen drive system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003Refusal of applicationpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
3513 Concord Pike, Suite 3001 Wilmington
Delaware 19803 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]For all designated states
BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
3513 Concord Pike, Suite 3001
Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bielagus, Joseph B.
21508 S.W. Christiansen Ct.
Tualatin, Oregon 97062 / US
[1998/27]
Representative(s)Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date97630083.005.12.1997
[1998/27]
Priority number, dateUS1996077339226.12.1996         Original published format: US 773392
[1998/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0850699
Date:01.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0850699
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B07B1/12, B07B1/42, D21B1/02
[1998/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/41]
Former [1998/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Antriebssystem für Stangensiebe[1998/27]
English:Bar screen drive system[1998/27]
French:Système d'entraînement pour cribles à barres[1998/27]
Examination procedure20.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
21.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
23.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
07.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/11]
17.10.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9402261  (WEYERHAEUSER CO [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,21 * abstract * * page 3, line 21 - page 5, line 32 * * page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 31; figure - * [A] 4,5,8,9,12,13,16-20;
 [XA]US5368168  (MARRS GEVAN R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,21 * column A * * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4,5,8,9,12,13,16,18-20;
 [A]WO9501918  (RADER INT AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-5,7-9,12,13,17-19,21 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 6; figure - *;
 [A]WO9307971  (EDEM STEEL LTD [CA]) [A] 1-5,7-9,12,13,15,17-19,21 * abstract * * page 13, line 29 - page 16, line 18; figure - *;
 [A]DE1162782  (VICTOR HALSTRICK K G) [A] 1,7,8,12,13,18,21 * column 1, line 1 - line 15 * * column 5, line 12 - line 31; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]WO9301005  (BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,6-8,13,18-21 * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 4 * * page 9, line 5 - line 29 * * page 12, line 20 - page 14, line 24; figures 1-3,7,16,17 *;
 [D]US5305891  (BIELAGUS JOSEPH B [US]);
 [A]DE3738082  (BAUAKADEMIE DDR [DD]) [A] 1,7,8,13,15,21 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 25; figure - *