Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0825019

EP0825019 - Wrap material with additive delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.10.2003  [2003/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Transhield AS
Ulvenveien 92 a
0581 Oslo / NO
[1999/45]
Former [1998/09]For all designated states
Transhield Technology Co. LLC
53664-1 County Road 9
Elkhart, Indiana 46514 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Todt, Gregory L.
53664-1 County Road 9
Elkhart, Indiana 46514 / US
[1998/09]
Representative(s)Duffy, Assumpta Dympna , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [1998/09]Duffy, Assumpta Dympna , et al
F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road, Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date97650033.006.08.1997
[1998/09]
Priority number, dateUS1996069939519.08.1996         Original published format: US 699395
US1996069946119.08.1996         Original published format: US 699461
[1998/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0825019
Date:25.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0825019
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/18, D04H13/00, C09J7/02, B65D65/40, B32B27/08, C09J11/00, C09J153/00, C23F11/02, B65D81/26
[1998/48]
Former International [1998/09]B32B27/18, D04H13/00, C09J7/02, B65D65/40
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/09]
Extension statesAL12.07.2000
LT12.07.2000
LV12.07.2000
RO12.07.2000
SI12.07.2000
TitleGerman:Verpackungsmaterial mit einem Additivabgabesystem[1998/09]
English:Wrap material with additive delivery system[1998/09]
French:Matériau d'emballage ayant un système de libération d'un additif[1998/09]
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
01.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/41]
07.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/41]
18.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB1048770  (CANADIAN TECHNICAL TAPE LTD) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 68 - line 73; claims 1-3 * [A] 21-23,28;
 [X]EP0217275  (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 10-13,15 * claims 1,8-17 * * column 6, line 37 - line 58 * * column 7, line 12 - line 21 * * page 7, line 33 - line 55 * * column 5, line 34 - line 44 *;
 [X]GB2140959  (CANON KK) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 54 - line 53; example 1; claims 1,14,15 *;
 [X]EP0483126  (CLOROX CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 7 - line 11; claim 1 *;
 [X]ZA7002387  ;
 [X]DE2112979  (FIBREBOARD CORP) [X] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0202771  (AICELLO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0215480  (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * claim - *;
 [A]DE4328716  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] * claim 6 *;
 [A]GB2198062  (ACRATHANE PROD LTD)
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 71-28151S, XP002079681 & ZA7002387 A 00000000 (FIBREBOARD CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *