Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0791421

EP0791421 - Fixture between an insert holder and a tool holder of a boring head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heinz Kaiser AG
Glattalstrasse 516
8153 Rümlang / CH
[1997/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Kaiser, Heinz
Höhenstrasse 29
8304 Wallisellen / CH
02 / Pape, Dieter
Im Aegler 3e
8153 Rümlang / CH
03 / Woerz, Hans
Rebstrasse 37
8156 Oberhasli / CH
[1997/35]
Representative(s)Groner, Manfred , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Gotthardstrasse 53
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1997/35]Groner, Manfred , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date97810088.121.02.1997
[1997/35]
Priority number, dateCH1996000045522.02.1996         Original published format: CH 45596
[1997/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0791421
Date:27.08.1997
Language:DE
[1997/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0791421
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:B23B29/034
[1997/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/35]
TitleGerman:Verbindung zwischen einem Schneidenhalter und einem Werkzeugträger eines Ausdrehkopfes[1997/35]
English:Fixture between an insert holder and a tool holder of a boring head[1997/35]
French:Fixation entre le porte-plaquette et le porte-outil d'une tête à aléser[1997/35]
Examination procedure27.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/13]
07.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
17.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.1999Fee for grant paid
06.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL05.04.2000
[2003/09]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0249892  (WOHLHAUPTER E & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 1 - line 10; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9102614  (KOMET STAHLHALTER WERKZEUG [DE])