Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0825408

EP0825408 - Portable device preventing unauthorized use of an article [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.10.2001 [2001/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hirschi, Daniel
Obere Stadelstrasse 9
3653 Oberhofen / CH
For all designated states
Jann, Norbert
Speiserslehn 33
9320 Stachen / CH
[1998/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Hirschi, Daniel
Obere Stadelstrasse 9
3653 Oberhofen / CH
02 / Battiston, Daniel
Solothurnstrasse 36
3422 Kirchberg / CH
03 / Jann, Norbert
Postfach 5
9320 Stachen / CH
04 / Küttel, Albin
Kappelisackerstrasse 52
3063 Ittigen / CH
05 / Zbinden, Peter
Sonnrain 10
3662 Seftigen / CH
[1998/09]
Representative(s)Roshardt, Werner Alfred , et al
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG
Eigerstrasse 2
Postfach
3000 Bern 14 / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/09]Roshardt, Werner Alfred, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Zeughausgasse 5 Postfach
3000 Bern 7 / CH
Application number, filing date97810565.813.08.1997
[1998/09]
Priority number, dateCH1996000206623.08.1996         Original published format: CH 206696
[1998/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0825408
Date:25.02.1998
Language:DE
[1998/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0825408
Date:07.06.2000
[2000/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:F41A17/00, E05B73/00
[1998/09]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/07]
Former [1998/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Handliche transportable Vorrichtung zur Verhinderung einer unbefugten Handhabung eines Gegenstands[1998/09]
English:Portable device preventing unauthorized use of an article[1998/09]
French:Dispositif empêchant l'utilisation non-autorisée d'un article[1998/09]
Examination procedure11.12.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/42]
16.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.01.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.01.2001M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5417000  (CHEN MIKE [TW]) [X] 1,5 * column W * [Y] 2;
 [Y]US5394717  (YU SANDY T S [CA]) [Y] 2 * column 10, line 43 - column 11, line 4 *;
 [X]US5392552  (MCCARTHY JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * column W *;
 [X]US5419068  (PAGES DARRIN A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column W *;
 [A]US5283971  (FULLER ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column W *;
 [A]US5487234  (DRAGON PAUL K [US]) [A] 1-6 * column W *;
 [A]US5024017  (NISHIOKA JIM Z [US]) [A] 2 * column 3, lines 3-7 *