Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0826455

EP0826455 - Automatic pincer for electroerosion electrodes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 21.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sarix S.A.
Via ai Molini 22
6616 Losone / CH
[1998/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Salim, Ehsan
Via Pezza Venerdi 42
6616 Losone / CH
02 / Rigamonti, Giorgio
Via Caponelli 7
6604 Locarno / CH
[1998/10]
Representative(s)Fiammenghi-Domenighetti, Delfina , et al
Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi
Via San Gottardo 15
6900 Lugano / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]Fiammenghi-Domenighetti, Delfina , et al
Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi, Via San Gottardo 15
6900 Lugano / CH
Application number, filing date97810612.829.08.1997
[1998/10]
Priority number, dateCH1996000216403.09.1996         Original published format: CH 216496
[1998/10]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0826455
Date:04.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0826455
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:B23H1/00, B23H7/26
[1998/10]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1999/03]
Former [1999/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  LI 
Former [1998/47](deleted) 
Former [1998/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Automatische Greifvorrichtung für Funkenerosionselektroden[1998/10]
English:Automatic pincer for electroerosion electrodes[1998/10]
French:Dispositif de maintien automatique pour électrodes d'électroérosion[1998/10]
Examination procedure30.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/27]
05.09.1998Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
16.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.1999Fee for grant paid
16.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.10.1998AT   M01   Fee paid on   11.11.1998
21.10.1998BE   M01   Fee paid on   11.11.1998
21.10.1998CH   M01   Fee paid on   11.11.1998
21.10.1998DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.11.1998
21.10.1998DK   M01   Fee paid on   11.11.1998
21.10.1998ES   M01   Fee paid on   11.11.1998
21.10.1998FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.10.1998FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.10.1998GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.10.1998GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.10.1998IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.10.1998IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.10.1998LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.10.1998MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.10.1998NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.10.1998PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.10.1998SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR12.04.2000
IT12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DE13.07.2000
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]FR12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DE13.07.2000
Former [2003/09]NL12.04.2000
DE13.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2002/13]DE13.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2001/16]FR08.09.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0129340  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0286779  (RAYCON TEXTRON INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 27, line 25 - page 31, line 19 * * abstract *