Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0911437

EP0911437 - Embroidery machine, particularly of the Schiffli type, with movable thread guide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2002Opposition rejectedpublished on 04.12.2002  [2002/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Franz Lässer AG
Hohenemserstrasse 17
CH-9444 Diepoldsau / CH
[1999/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Lässer, Franz
Hohenemserstrasse 17
9444 Diepoldsau / CH
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Riederer, Conrad A. , et al
c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 Postfach
7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]Riederer, Conrad A., Dr. , et al
Bahnhofstrasse 10
7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
Application number, filing date97810797.727.10.1997
[1999/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0911437
Date:28.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0911437
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:D05C11/16, D05C11/10
[1999/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   IT,   LI [2000/02]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stickmaschine, insbesondere Schifflistickmaschine, mit beweglichem Fadenleiter[1999/17]
English:Embroidery machine, particularly of the Schiffli type, with movable thread guide[1999/17]
French:Machine à broder, en particulier de type Schiffli, avec guide fil mobile[1999/17]
Examination procedure29.03.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/21]
29.03.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
22.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.06.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
30.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.1999Fee for grant paid
27.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.01.2001  06.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Saurer Sticksysteme AG
Textilstrasse 2
CH-9320 Arbon / CH
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/15]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2001  06.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Saurer Sticksysteme AG
Textilstrasse 2
CH-9320 Arbon / CH
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
Former [2001/13]
Opponent(s)01  19.01.2001  06.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Saurer Sticksysteme AG
Textilstrasse 2
CH-9320 Arbon / CH
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Günter, Dr.
Patentanwalt Dr.-Ing. P. Riebling, Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
22.02.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.06.2002Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/49]
18.06.2002Date of oral proceedings
04.07.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.07.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[DX]EP0634512  (SAURER STICKSYSTEME AG [CH]) [DX] 1-7 * column 3, line 41 - line 45 *;
 [X]US2649065  (LOUIS CASPER) [X] 1,2 * column 14, line 8 - column 17, line 70 *;
 [A]DE283628  (E. BETZ) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE271289  (VOGTLÄNDISCHE MASCHINENFABRIK A.G.) [A] 1 * page 2, line 70 - line 90 *;
 [A]DE256936  (C. FARMER) [A] 17 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR459480  (VOGTLAENDISCHE MASCHINEN-FABRIK VORM J C & H DIETR [DE]) [A] 1;
 [A]DE2114820  (COMERIO ERCOLE SPA)