Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0919374

EP0919374 - Device for applying an insert [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GRAPHA-HOLDING AG
Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170
6052 Hergiswil / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]For all designated states
GRAPHA-HOLDING AG
Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170
6052 Hergiswil / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Boss, Christian
Mühlemattstrasse 5
4800 Zofingen / CH
02 / Lüthi, Ernst
Bündtenweg 11
4805 Brittnau / CH
[1999/22]
Application number, filing date97810905.625.11.1997
[1999/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0919374
Date:02.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0919374
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:B41F13/68, B42C1/10
[1999/22]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/07]
Former [1999/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Anbringen einer Beilage[1999/22]
English:Device for applying an insert[1999/22]
French:Dispositif pour appliquer un encart[1999/22]
Examination procedure18.10.1999Examination requested  [1999/51]
12.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2002Fee for grant paid
31.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0776771  (GRAPHA HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO8304221  (FLENSBURG CARL G A, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0570339  (GRAPHA HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] * abstract *