Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0914990

EP0914990 - Moulding element for motor car bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INDUSTRIE ILPEA S.p.A.
Viale dell'Industria, 37
21023 Malgesso (Varese) / IT
[2000/16]
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
INDUSTRIE ILPEA S.P.A.
Viale dell'Industria, 37
21023 Malgesso (VA) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Laudwein, Ralf
Via Marconi, 9
21020 Bardello (Varese) / IT
02 / Cittadini, Paolo
Via Campo dei Fiori, 1
21020 Luvinate (Varese) / IT
03 / Ferrante, Pier Paolo
Via Giuseppe Maggi, 20
21100 Cuvio (Varese) / IT
[1999/19]
Representative(s)Sutto, Luca
Gambro Intellectual Property Department
P.O. Box 98
41037 Mirandola (MO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]Sutto, Luca
Bugnion S.p.A., Viale Lancetti, 19
20158 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date97830302.225.06.1997
[1999/19]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0914990
Date:12.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0914990
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60R13/04
[1999/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/19]
TitleGerman:Formteil für Kraftfahrzeugkarosserie[1999/19]
English:Moulding element for motor car bodies[1999/19]
French:Pièce moulée pour carrosseries de voitures[1999/19]
Examination procedure03.03.1998Examination requested  [1999/19]
03.03.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
22.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
10.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1999Date of oral proceedings
07.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.1999Fee for grant paid
22.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99104123.7  / EP0924121
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US2020993  (CHAMBERLIN CLARENCE P) [X] 1,2,6 * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US2835924  (SCHMELING WILLIAM H) [X] 1,3 * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE4105032  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE9307620U  (BAEDJE K H METEOR GUMMIWERKE [DE]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0337884  (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE4126442  (TRW UNITED-CARR) [A] 1 * figures 1-11 *;
 [A]DE29502439U  (EUWE EUGEN WEXLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *