Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0887265

EP0887265 - Packaging unit for continuously producing sealed packages, containing pourable food products, from a tube of packaging material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA
Avenue Général-Guisan 70
1009 Pully / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA
Avenue Général-Guisan 70, P.O. Box 430
1009 Pully / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Hansson, Lennart
Professorvägan, 3
23731 Bgärred / SE
02 / Dunge, Felix
Stora Tvärgatan, 4
22353 Lund / SE
03 / Friberg, Lennart
Vallarum, 14
27033 Vollsjö / SE
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Franzolin, Luigi , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Franzolin, Luigi , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date97830315.427.06.1997
[1999/01]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0887265
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0887265
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:B65B9/12, B65B51/30, B65B57/04
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/36]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verpackungsmaschine zum kontinuierlichen Herstellen von versiegelten Verpackungen fliessfähiger Nahrungsmittel aus schlauchförmigem Verpackungsmaterial[1999/01]
English:Packaging unit for continuously producing sealed packages, containing pourable food products, from a tube of packaging material[1999/01]
French:Machine d'emballage pour produire en continu des emballages scellés contenant un produit alimentaire sous forme liquide, dans un matériau d'emballage tubulaire[1999/01]
Examination procedure28.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/34]
01.07.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.10.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT
03.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2002Fee for grant paid
10.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.08.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US3388526  (HARM ALSON R, et al) [A] 1,8,9 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US3729894  (STOHLQUIST R) [A] 1-5 * figures 16,17 *