Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0890474

EP0890474 - Tiltable ramp for a load floor of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Modulcar S.r.l.
No. 3, Via B. Croce
42014 Castellarano (Reggio Emilia) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/47]For all designated states
Modulcar S.r.l.
120, via S. Anna
41100 Modena / IT
Former [1999/02]For all designated states
Baraldi, Giuliano
No. 75, Via Nievo
41100 Modena (MO) / IT
For all designated states
Camellini, Giancarlo
No. 14, Via Agnesi
41100 Modena (MO) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Baraldi, Giugliano
75, via Nievo
41100 Modena / IT
02 / Camellini, Giancarlo
14, via Agnesi
41100 Modena / IT
 [2002/38]
Former [2001/47]01 / Baraldi, Giuliano
75, via Nievo
41100 Modena / IT
02 / Camellini, Giancarlo
14, via Agnesi
41100 Modena / IT
Former [1999/02]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Gotra, Stefano , et al
BUGNION S.p.A.
Via M. Vellani, 20
41124 Modena / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/02]Gotra, Stefano , et al
BUGNION S.p.A. No. 25, Via Emilia Est
41100 Modena / IT
Application number, filing date97830346.911.07.1997
[1999/02]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0890474
Date:13.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0890474
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60P1/43
[1999/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/38]
Former [1999/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kippbare Rampe für die Ladefläche eines Kraftfahrzeugs[1999/02]
English:Tiltable ramp for a load floor of a motor vehicle[1999/02]
French:Rampe basculante pour la plateforme de chargement d'un véhicule à moteur[1999/02]
Examination procedure06.07.1999Examination requested  [1999/36]
14.07.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.11.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT
31.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2002Fee for grant paid
29.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.09.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200105   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
[2005/21]
Former [2003/39]AT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/30]NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE25.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2150526  (SPARROW RALPH WILSON) [X] 1-3,7,10-12 * page 1, line 100 - page 2, line 25; figures 1-5 * * page 2, line 41 - line 46 *;
 [X]EP0504958  (MAZZOLI WILLIAM [IT]) [X] 1-3,7,10-12 * column 1, line 39 - column 3, line 15; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US3580404  (MOSER WILLIAM J) [X] 8,10 * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE1925442U  (OTTO GAISER FAHRZEUGBAU MITTEL [DE]) [X] 9 * page 4, line 5 - line 10; figures 1-3 *