Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0917896

EP0917896 - Apparatus for playing simulated table sport games and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.07.2002  [2002/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FRABOSK CASALINGHI S.p.A.
Via Massimo D'Azeglio 61
25067 Lumezzane S.A. (Brescia) / IT
[1999/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Ghidini, Tiziano
Via San Francesco 4
25067 Lumezzane S.A. (Brescia) / IT
[1999/21]
Representative(s)Sutto, Luca
Bugnion S.p.A.
Via Dante 17
25122 Brescia / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/21]Sutto, Luca
Bugnion S.p.A., Via Dante 17
25122 Brescia / IT
Application number, filing date97830570.404.11.1997
[1999/21]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0917896
Date:26.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0917896
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP01.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:A63F7/24, A63F7/06
[1999/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/05]
Former [1999/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Spielen von Tischsportspielen und ähnlichem[1999/21]
English:Apparatus for playing simulated table sport games and the like[1999/21]
French:Dispositf pour jouer des jeux de table sportifs ou similaires[1999/21]
Examination procedure21.08.1998Examination requested  [1999/21]
21.08.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
22.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.10.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
09.06.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2000Fee for grant paid
01.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Request for further processing for:29.07.1999Request for further processing filed
29.07.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.08.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES03.05.2000
[2002/27]
Documents cited:Search[X]GB366276  (AUSTIN READ) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 68 - line 95; figure - *;
 [X]DE648041  (KLEEFELD & CO SPIELWARENFABRIK) [X] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE8521931U  (SCHUHN) [A] 1,6 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US3547443  (LACSON JOSE JOB) [A] 2 * figure 4 *;
 [A]US4357017  (SCHNEIDER HERMAN E, et al) [A] 2 * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0766980  (BRIGHTMORE JAMES GRAHAM [GB]) [A] 3 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US3741544  (WOLFF N) [A] 1 * column 1, line 5 - line 12 *