Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0804045

EP0804045 - Adaptive multimedia service [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TELIA AB
123 86 Farsta / SE
[2005/22]
Former [1997/44]For all designated states
TELIA AB
126 86 Farsta / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Emilsson, Stellan
Grän 31
655 94 Karlstad / SE
[1997/44]
Representative(s)Hopfgarten, Nils , et al
Groth & Co. KB
P.O. Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/15]Hopfgarten, Nils , et al
L.A. Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
Former [1999/26](deleted)
...
Former [1997/44]Karlsson, Berne
Telia Research AB, Rudsjöterrassen 2
136 80 Haninge / SE
Application number, filing date97850034.607.03.1997
[1997/44]
Priority number, dateSE1996000155824.04.1996         Original published format: SE 9601558
[1997/44]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0804045
Date:29.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0804045
Date:09.06.1999
[1999/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0804045
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/22, H04Q7/32
[1997/44]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1997/44]
TitleGerman:Adaptiver Multimediadienst[1997/44]
English:Adaptive multimedia service[1997/44]
French:Service multimédia adaptatif[1997/44]
Examination procedure09.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
16.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2005Fee for grant paid
11.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH01.06.2005
FR01.06.2005
LI01.06.2005
NL01.06.2005
ES12.09.2005
[2009/01]
Former [2006/22]CH01.06.2005
LI01.06.2005
NL01.06.2005
ES12.09.2005
Former [2006/14]CH01.06.2005
LI01.06.2005
ES12.09.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0459344  (CIT ALCATEL) [X] 1,2,6 * column 1, line 1 - line 22 * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 25 * * column 4, line 39 - line 46 *;
 [X]WO9316550  (BELL ATLANTIC NETWORK SERVICES) [X] 1,5 * page 10, line 5 - page 11, line 24; figures 3,5 *;
 [A]WO9217943  (MOTOROLA INC) [A] 1,6 * claims 1,2,3,4; page 11, line 26 - line 33 *