EP0819874 - Fluid flow control valve device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth Teknik AB Varuvägen 7, Älvsjö 125 81 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth Teknik AB Varuvägen 7, Älvsjö 125 81 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states AB REXROTH MECMAN S-125 81 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grundby, Mattias Hökmossvägen 17 155 31 Nykvarn / SE | 02 /
Hedlund, Staffan Sätragardsvägen 115 127 36 Skärholmen / SE | [2002/35] |
Former [1998/04] | 01 /
Grundby, Mattias Hökmossvägen 17 155 31 Nykvarn / SE | ||
02 /
Hedlund, Staffan Sätragardsvägen 115 127 36 Skarholmen / SE | Representative(s) | Janson, Ronny, et al Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Janson, Ronny, et al Axel Ehrners Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 97850107.0 | 03.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | SE19960002721 | 09.07.1996 Original published format: SE 9602721 | [1998/04] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0819874 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0819874 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819874 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/00 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
F16K27/041 (EP,US);
F15B13/042 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87225 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/31] | F16K27/04, F15B13/042 | ||
Former IPC [1998/04] | F16K1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/16] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Durchflussregelventil | [1998/04] | English: | Fluid flow control valve device | [1998/04] | French: | Soupape de régulation de débit | [2002/05] |
Former [1998/04] | soupape de régulation de débit | Examination procedure | 24.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 22.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4643225 (IMHOF RAINER [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4763691 (HAHMANN WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4860792 (ICHIHASHI KOUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0686775 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US4617967 | US4643225 |