Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0873280

EP0873280 - METHOD FOR ENCLOSING AN OBJECT WITH A TRANSPARENT ENCAPSULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 25.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Standard Group Holding B.V.
Rijksstraatweg392
2242 CZ Wassenaar / NL
[1998/44]
Inventor(s)01 / ZANDVLIET, Johannes, Maria
Rijksstraatweg 392
NL-2242 CZ Wassenaar / NL
02 / MALHERBE DE JUVIGNY, René, Cornelis
Bredehaven 67
NL-5211 TM 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
[1998/44]
Representative(s)Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/44]Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date97900485.013.01.1997
[1998/44]
WO1997NL00010
Priority number, dateNL1996100207412.01.1996         Original published format: NL 1002074
NL1996100244126.02.1996         Original published format: NL 1002441
NL1996100273929.03.1996         Original published format: NL 1002739
[1998/44]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9725282
Date:17.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0873280
Date:28.10.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1997
[1998/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0873280
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:C03B19/02, B44C5/00, G09F23/00
[1998/44]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM UMHÜLLEN EINES GEGENSTANDS MIT EINER TRANSPARENTEN KAPSEL[1998/44]
English:METHOD FOR ENCLOSING AN OBJECT WITH A TRANSPARENT ENCAPSULATION[1998/44]
French:PROCEDE D'ENCAPSULAGE D'UN OBJET DANS UNE ENVELOPPE TRANSPARENTE[1998/44]
Entry into regional phase15.07.1998Translation filed 
15.07.1998National basic fee paid 
15.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/44]
26.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2000Fee for grant paid
27.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US2073254  (BRYCE REDMAN ALLEN) [A] 1,15 * column W *;
 [A]US2350421  (SCHODER WILLIAM P, et al) [A] 1,15 * column W *;
 [A]US3254979  (KNAPP WARREN R, et al) [A] 1,15 * column W *;
 [A]US3489545  (BUSSY JACQUES MARIE YVES LE CL) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3463624  (LABINO DOMINICK) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3726022  (ITI INST FUER TECH INNOVATION [DE]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1879816  (KRIEG ANTHONY W) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1880118  (ALLYN ROBERT S) [A] 1,15 * column W *;
 [X]US4067947  (MIORI NILO M) [X] 1,9,15 * column W *;
 [X]FR2683183  (SEXTANT AVIONIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,9,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4278626  (ATANASOVSKI MARIN) [X] 1,9,15 * column W *;
 [X]DE8905796U  (KORZILIUS SÖHNE GMBH) [X] 1,9,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4643693  (RUBINSTEIN EDNA [IL]) [X] 1,9,15 * column W *;
 [X]WO9011481  (HOBELSBERGER JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1,9,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR2324470  (PAULEY GERALD [AU]) [X] 1,9,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4584212  (KLEIN TOAN [CA], et al) [A] 1,9,15 * column W *;
 [X]FR1178558  (FREBAULT) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *