Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0879024

EP0879024 - IMPRESSION SYSTEM FOR AN END OF AN IMPLANT PROJECTING FROM A HUMAN TISSUE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IE
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSTITUT STRAUMANN AG
Hauptstrasse 26d
4437 Waldenburg / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]For all designated states
Institut Straumann AG
Hauptstrasse 26d
4437 Waldenburg / CH
Inventor(s)01 / GRANDE, Vincenzo
Salinenstrasse 3a
CH-4313 Möhlin / CH
02 / BAUMGARTNER, Reto
Fasanenstrasse 2
CH-4402 Frenkendorf / CH
03 / TSCHIRKY, Roger
Stutzring 5
CH-4107 Ettingen / CH
[1998/48]
Representative(s)Ullrich, Gerhard , et al
BOHEST AG
Postfach 160
4003 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]Ullrich, Gerhard, Dr. , et al
A. Braun, Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date97900923.031.01.1997
[1998/48]
WO1997CH00031
Priority number, dateCH1996000032608.02.1996         Original published format: CH 32696
[1998/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9728755
Date:14.08.1997
Language:DE
[1997/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0879024
Date:25.11.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997
[1998/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0879024
Date:29.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61C9/00
[1998/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/48]
TitleGerman:ABDRUCKSYSTEM FÜR EINEN AUS DER MENSCHLICHEN GEWEBESTRUKTUR AUSTRETENDEN IMPLANTATABSCHLUSS[1998/48]
English:IMPRESSION SYSTEM FOR AN END OF AN IMPLANT PROJECTING FROM A HUMAN TISSUE STRUCTURE[1998/48]
French:SYSTEME D'EMPREINTE POUR EXTREMITE D'IMPLANT EMERGEANT D'UNE STRUCTURE TISSULAIRE HUMAINE[1998/48]
Entry into regional phase20.02.1998National basic fee paid 
20.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/48]
16.12.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
26.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.02.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
23.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.1999Fee for grant paid
12.04.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.06.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB29.09.1999
PT29.12.1999
BE31.01.2000
LU31.01.2000
[2007/29]
Former [2001/12]GB29.09.1999
IE29.09.1999
PT29.12.1999
BE31.01.2000
Former [2001/11]GB29.09.1999
PT29.12.1999
BE31.01.2000
Former [2001/07]GB29.09.1999
PT29.12.1999
Former [2000/26]PT29.12.1999
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE4415670  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - SCHROEDER, SUTTER, BUSER, KREKELER, ORALE IMPLANTOLOGIE, STUTTGART, DE, 2. AUFL. THIEME VERLAG, XP002012099 [AD] 1 * page 202 - page 209 *