Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0882126

EP0882126 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A DETERGENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:BE  DE  ES  FR  IT 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/50]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:BE  DE  ES  FR  IT 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / CRISOLOGO, Reiner, Jumao-as Abdul Wahab Al-Ghamdi
Building Ground floor, Flat 3 Zaynal St.
Ghulayl District Al Mahjar Road Jeddah / SA
02 / GARCIA, Marcelito, Abad Abdul Wahab Al-Ghamdi
Building Ground floor, Flat 3 Zaynal St.
Ghulayl District Al Mahjar Road Jeddah / SA
03 / JORDAN, David, Alan
22 Alcazar Sierra Village Arabian Homes
Jeddah / SA
[1998/50]
Representative(s)Elliott, Peter William , et al
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford
MK44 1LQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]Elliott, Peter William , et al
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford
MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [2003/13]Elliott, Peter William , et al
Unilever PLC Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [2002/44]Agnew, Andrew , et al
Unilever plc Patent Department Colworth House
Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [1998/50]Mole, Peter Geoffrey , et al
UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date97901008.906.01.1997
[1998/50]
WO1997EP00118
Priority number, dateGB1996000192031.01.1996         Original published format: GB 9601920
[1998/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9728246
Date:07.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0882126
Date:09.12.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997
[1998/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0882126
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/06, C11D11/00
[1998/50]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG[1998/50]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A DETERGENT COMPOSITION[1998/50]
French:PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DETERGENTE[1998/50]
Entry into regional phase30.06.1998National basic fee paid 
30.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/50]
29.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1999Fee for grant paid
28.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.01.2001  19.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
HENKEL KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  19.01.2001  31.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2007/17]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2001  19.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  19.01.2001  31.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2002/34]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2001  19.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  19.01.2001  31.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2001/11]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2001  19.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  19.01.2001  31.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2001/09]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2001  19.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
27.02.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.07.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.10.2002Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.09.2006Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/17]
09.11.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.11.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.11.2006Date of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition10.01.2003Appeal received No.  T0058/03
28.02.2003Statement of grounds filed
08.06.2004Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
08.06.2004Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2004Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS6072998  ;
 [A]WO9501418  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-5,7,11 * claim - *;
 [A]JPH0813000  ;
 [A]JPH06128594  ;
 [A]JPS6072999  ;
 [A]JPS59157198
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 23, Database accession no. 85-137896, XP002032014 & JPS6072998 A 19850425 (KAO CORP) [A] 1,3,4,7-9,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 12, Database accession no. 96-112966, XP002032015 & JPH0813000 A 19960116 (LION CORP) [A] 1-5,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 23, Database accession no. 94-189223, XP002032016 & JPH06128594 A 19940510 (LION CORP) [A] 1-5,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 50, Database accession no. 85-312679, XP002032017 & JPS6072999 A 19850425 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-5,9,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 42, Database accession no. 84-259618, XP002032018 & JPS59157198 A 19840906 (LION CORP) [A] 1-5,11 * abstract *