Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0886579

EP0886579 - DEVICE FOR DUSTING PRINTED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Platsch, Hans G.
Kupferstrasse 40
70565 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
PLATSCH, Hans G.
Kupferstrasse 40
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Ostertag, Reinhard
Ostertag & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Epplestrasse 14
70597 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Ostertag, Reinhard
Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10
70597 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97901026.115.01.1997
[1999/01]
WO1997EP00147
Priority number, dateDE199610943811.03.1996         Original published format: DE 19609438
[1999/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9733753
Date:18.09.1997
Language:DE
[1997/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0886579
Date:30.12.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997
[1999/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0886579
Date:16.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:B41F23/06
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/01]
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG ZUM BESTÄUBEN VON DRUCKPRODUKTEN[1999/01]
English:DEVICE FOR DUSTING PRINTED PRODUCTS[1999/01]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR SAUPOUDRER DES PRODUITS D'IMPRESSION[1999/01]
Entry into regional phase27.07.1998National basic fee paid 
27.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/53]
29.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2000Fee for grant paid
06.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.01.2002  20.02.2002  ADMISSIBLE
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Mülheimer Strasse 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Stahl, Dietmar
manroland AG
Intellectual Property (IPB)
Postfach 10 12 64
63012 Offenbach am Main / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/30]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2002  20.02.2002  ADMISSIBLE
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Mülheimer Strasse 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Stahl, Dietmar
manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64
63012 Offenbach am Main / DE
Former [2002/13]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2002   
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Mühlheimer Strasse 341
D- 63075 Offenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Stahl, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing.
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Mühlheimer Strasse 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
11.04.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.12.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.09.2004Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/22]
28.09.2004Date of oral proceedings
07.12.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.12.2004Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US3053180  (DOYLE DONALD J) [X] 1 * column W *;
 [X]DE4341566  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 9, line 26 - line 40; figure 4 *
ExaminationEP0771649