Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0879001

EP0879001 - STAB-RESISTANT INSERT FOR PROTECTIVE TEXTILE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. BEKAERT S.A.
Bekaertstraat 2
8550 Zwevegem / BE
[1998/48]
Inventor(s)01 / BOURGOIS, Luc
Kwadestraat 59
B-8792 Desselgem / BE
02 / BRUYNEEL, Pol
Wielsbeeksestraat 119
B-8710 Wielsbeke / BE
03 / VANASSCHE, Roger
Paul Ferrardstraat 8A
B-8550 Zwevegem / BE
04 / VAN GIEL, Frans
Zolderstraat 12
B-8553 Otegem / BE
[1998/48]
Representative(s)Messely, Marc
NV Bekaert SA
IPD - PC6030
Bekaertstraat 2
8550 Zwevegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]Messely, Marc, Ir.
N.V. Bekaert S.A., Bekaertstraat 2
8550 Zwevegem / BE
Application number, filing date97901035.209.01.1997
[1998/48]
WO1997EP00163
Priority number, dateEP1996020022801.02.1996         Original published format: EP 96200228
[1998/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9727769
Date:07.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0879001
Date:25.11.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997
[1998/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0879001
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:A41D31/00, F41H1/02, D07B1/06
[1998/48]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   SE [1998/48]
TitleGerman:Stichschutzeinlage für Schutztextilien[2000/02]
English:STAB-RESISTANT INSERT FOR PROTECTIVE TEXTILE[1998/48]
French:PIECE D'INSERTION RESISTANT AUX COUPS DE POIGNARD POUR TEXTILE PROTECTEUR[1998/48]
Former [1998/48]Stichschutzeinlage Für Schutztextiuen
Entry into regional phase29.06.1998National basic fee paid 
29.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/48]
23.02.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
12.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
29.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.1999Fee for grant paid
30.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]FR1335584  (R.LECONTE) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0546962  (PROTECMA [FR]) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 1 - line 26 * * column 3, line 22 - line 34 *;
 [A]DE3023990  (ACKERMANN GOEGGINGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 2, line 5 - line 10 * * page 3, line 24 - line 38 *;
 [A]US5062161  (SUTTON ROGER I [US]) [A] 1,9 * column A *;
 [A]DE4407180  (MEHLER VARIO SYSTEM GMBH [DE]);
 [DA]US4408444  (BAILLIEVIER FREDDY [BE]);
 [A]LU84844  (TREFILARBED SA [LU]) [A] 12-14,17 * page 1, line 3 - line 12 * * page 4, line 5 - line 22 * * page 5, line 4 - line 6 *;
 [A]  - 31925, "Steel cord construction", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, EMSWORTH GB, (199011), no. 319, pages 868 - 871, XP000160150 [A] 12-14,18 * figures 1,3 *