blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0873495 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0873495



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 116
20.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.01.2000 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
17.01.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.10.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
06.10.1999 Description Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
15.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
28.05.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
09.03.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
09.03.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.12.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.09.1998 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.08.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
13.08.1998 Description Search / examination 6
13.08.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
13.08.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
13.08.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 11
02.06.1998 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
02.06.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
28.08.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
24.07.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
24.07.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 18
24.07.1997 Priority document Search / examination 12